Pecorari, Adriana Ida (CPSO#: 33373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
EXR Associates
1815 Ironstone Manor
#158
Pickering
Pickering ON  L1W 3W9
Phone: (905) 831-1800
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Rouge Valley Health Centre
2867 Ellesmere Avenue at Neilson
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4135
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA IDA PECORARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECORARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 28 Feb 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1982