Pedder, Linda (CPSO#: 56955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73508
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

685 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2E8
Canada
Phone: (905) 681-9200
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA PEDDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respirology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990