Pede, Leili (CPSO#: 51371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Pede Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pede ( CPSO# 51371 )

Business Address:
200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEILI PEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1983