Pederson, Glen Irwin (CPSO#: 66411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLEN IRWIN PEDERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1995