Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Pedretti, Luigi Teofanio (CPSO#: 64032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3200
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Luigi Pedretti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pedretti ( CPSO# 64032 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUIGI TEOFANIO PEDRETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDRETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992