Pedvis, Stacey Rhonda (CPSO#: 68960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2C6
Phone: (416) 644-0984
Fax: (416) 644-0985
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pedvis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedvis ( CPSO# 68960 )

Business Address:
601 - 2200 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 2C6
Phone Number: (416) 644-0984

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY RHONDA PEDVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDVIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2000