Peek, Corbett Grant (CPSO#: 25629)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Nov 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993