Peerbaye, Goolam Hossen (CPSO#: 25248)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Creole, English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yousouf Peerbaye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to access medical records may call Margaret at (416) 759-8631 or Dr. Peerbaye at (416) 383-9588.
Date Received: 08 Jan 2008

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2013