Peers, Garry Bergwyn (CPSO#: 67127)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000