Peirce, Karen Louise (CPSO#: 53470)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Website: http://www.docudavit.com Tel: (416) 781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 08 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014