Peirce, Michael William Koppens (CPSO#: 98028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107-444 Douro St
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

444 Douno Street
Suite 107
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hopsital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 519-272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM KOPPENS PEIRCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEIRCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016