Peiris, Malwattage Jagathsiri Priyanjith (CPSO#: 84820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Holly Medical Clinic
611 Holly Avenue
Suite 103
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone: (905) 878-0086
Fax: (905) 878-1562
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milton Family Care Centre
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 864-9898
Fax: (905) 864-9393
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.J.P. Peiris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peiris ( CPSO# 84820 )

Business Address:
Holly Medical Clinic
103 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 878-0086

Business Address:
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALWATTAGE JAGATHSIRI PRIYANJITH PEIRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEIRIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008