Pekeles, Gary Sean (CPSO#: 43519)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 2004