Pelausa, Ermelinda (CPSO#: 51375)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Jewish General Hospital 3755 Cote Ste Catherine Montreal, QC H3T 1E2
Date Received: 06 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014