Pelinska, Gabriela Roksana (CPSO#: 107987)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Oct 2015 to 23 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Apr 2016 to 24 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 25 Apr 2016 to 08 May 2016
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 May 2016