Pelletier, Annette Marie (CPSO#: 68887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Caldbick, Annette Marie (used until: 30 Sep 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
890 Mahoney Road
Timmins ON  P4R 0H6
Phone: (705) 365-7250
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Annette Pelletier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pelletier ( CPSO# 68887 )

Business Address:
890 Mahoney Road
Timmins ON  P4N 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 365-7250

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 7, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 27, 2018, Riverside Health Care notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s. 85.5 (2)2 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act and s. 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Annette Marie Pelletier resigned her privileges at Riverside Health Care Facilities, during the course of an investigation into her practice.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNETTE MARIE PELLETIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLETIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1997