Pelletier, Louise (CPSO#: 69721)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1999