Pellow, Mark Robin (CPSO#: 58453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building A, Unit 2
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robin Pellow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pellow ( CPSO# 58453 )

Business Address:
Building A
2A - 8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone Number: (905) 709-9709

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ROBIN PELLOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELLOW is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1988