Peloso, Paul Michael John (CPSO#: 63387)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1994