Pelz, David Michael (CPSO#: 28203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32429
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pelz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pelz ( CPSO# 28203 )
Dr. M. Pelz ( CPSO# 32003 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL PELZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976