Pen, Visal (CPSO#: 85355)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cambodian, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Visal Pen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 16 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2012