Pena, Alberto (CPSO#: 53609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Escuela Medico Militar, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2003