Pendergast, Patrick John (CPSO#: 58071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205-8312 McCowan Road
Markham ON  L3P 8E1
Phone: (905) 947-9437
Fax: (905) 947-8532
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick J. Pendergast Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Pendergast ( CPSO# 58071 )

Business Address:
205 - 8312 McCowan Road
Markham ON  L3P 8E1
Phone Number: (905) 947-9437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK JOHN PENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDERGAST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989