Pendergast, Sara Rebecca (CPSO#: 65477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6910
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4242
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doctor Sara Pendergast Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Dr. S. Pendergast ( CPSO# 65477 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SARA REBECCA PENDERGAST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDERGAST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993