Pendharkar, Sushama (CPSO#: 32765)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Nagpur University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital,
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7346
Fax: (905) 804-7970
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pendharkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pendharkar ( CPSO# 32766 )
Dr. S. Pendharkar ( CPSO# 32765 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7346

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSHAMA PENDHARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDHARKAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1981