Peng, Carol Yuen-Man (CPSO#: 63505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1920 Ellesmere Road
Suite 309
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (416) 289-0519
Fax: (416) 289-3910
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2128-288 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 5T7
Canada
Phone: 905-294-4990
Fax: 905-471-1916
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Peng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peng ( CPSO# 63505 )

Business Address:
Suite 2128
28 South Unionville Avenue
Markham ON  L3P 5T7
Phone Number: (905) 294-4990

Business Address:
309 - 1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 289-0519

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL YUEN-MAN PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1992