Peng, Shane (CPSO#: 58090)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Japanese

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2007