Peng, Si-Liang (CPSO#: 110910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarity Eye- Vaughan site
9135 Keele Street, Unit A5
Vaughan, ON
Vaughan ON  L4K0G7
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Clarity Eye-Scarborough site
240 Alton Towers Circle Suite 300
Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

350 Rutherford Rd,
Suite 300 Plaza II
Brampton ON
Brampton ON  L6W 4N6
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

145 Kingston Road, East
Unit 3
Ajax ON
Ajax ON  L1S 7J4
Canada
Phone: 416-663-3937
Fax: 416-663-3731
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SI-LIANG PENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017