Peniston, Charles Maclean (CPSO#: 51324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone: (905) 868-8374
Fax: (905) 868-8371
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles M. Peniston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2009


Corporation Name: Charles M. Peniston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peniston ( CPSO# 51324 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
30 Prospect Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3S9
Phone Number: (905) 868-8374

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES MACLEAN PENISTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENISTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1984