Penkin, Paula-Lea (CPSO#: 65852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2009