Penn, Ian Mark (CPSO#: 61473)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1995