Pennie, Ross Alexander (CPSO#: 29214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013