Penning, Johannes Pieter (CPSO#: 32548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Penning Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penning ( CPSO# 32548 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNES PIETER PENNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987