Pennington, Jason John (CPSO#: 75057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital - General
Medical Mall
Suite 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-3899
Fax: (416) 438-6503
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason J. Pennington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pennington ( CPSO# 75057 )

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Room 511
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-3899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON JOHN PENNINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENNINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005