Penswick, John Lawrence (CPSO#: 58466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone: 705 645 4400 Ext. 3139
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Penswick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Penswick ( CPSO# 58466 )

Business Address:
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Business Address:
Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-0022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN LAWRENCE PENSWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENSWICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988