Pentland, Neomi (CPSO#: 51325)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro Health Services Unit 411 1230 Old Innes Road Ottawa, ON K1B 3V3 Tel: 613 738 1242
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014