Pepin, Andre Claude (CPSO#: 29067)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2000