Pepper, Dale James (CPSO#: 57102)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richmond Clinic
141 Richmond St
Chatham ON  N7M 1P1
Phone: (519) 397-5222
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

785 Techmseh Rd
Walpole Island First Nation
Wallaceburg ON  N8A4K9
Canada
Phone: 519-627-9225
Fax: 519-627-0430
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

1044 Duferin Ave
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2V8
Canada
Phone: (519) 626-9575
Fax: (519) 626-9317
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Tecumseh Clinic
3955 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor ON  N8Y 2J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-4140
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dale Pepper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pepper ( CPSO# 57102 )

Business Address:
1044 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2V8
Phone Number: (519) 626-9575

Business Address:
141 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1P1
Phone Number: (519) 397-5222

Business Address:
785 Tecumseh Road
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 4K9

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
Sydenham Campus ER
325 Margaret Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 628-8154

Business Address:
Tecumseh Clinic
3955 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 944-4140


Corporation Name: Donald Hastings Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pepper ( CPSO# 57102 )
Dr. D. Hastings ( CPSO# 32594 )

Business Address:
Chatham-Kent Family Health Team
207 - 20 Emma Street
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5
Phone Number: (519) 354-2172

Business Address:
141 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1P1
Phone Number: (519) 397-5222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 May 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE JAMES PEPPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987