Percival, Heather Anne (CPSO#: 62237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Community Family Health Team
P O Box 460
32 B Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: (519) 600-2501
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Percival Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Percival ( CPSO# 62237 )

Business Address:
Huron Community Family Health Team
32-B Centennial Drive
Suite 1
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 600-2273

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER ANNE PERCIVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERCIVAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991