Pereira, Andre Martins (CPSO#: 82000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radiology Now Inc.
301 - 45 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9
Phone: (416) 964-6776
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2004 to 25 Dec 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 26 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Oct 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 27 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.   Andre  Martins  Pereira  may  practise  diagnostic  radiology  with
                  Radiology  Now Inc., in Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable at the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires on December 31,
                  2018.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Pereira's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Pereira's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on January 4, 2018, and  will  expire  on  or
                  before December 31, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)