Pereira, Christine Maria Josefrieda (CPSO#: 52691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 101
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3853
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charal and Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 14 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Pereira ( CPSO# 52691 )
Dr. J. Charal ( CPSO# 52539 )

Business Address:
105 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 813-3850

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARIA JOSEFRIEDA PEREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1985