Pereira, Derek John (CPSO#: 92627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Mar 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Iberoamericana(UNIBE), 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32163
Fax: (416) 747-3611
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pereira ( CPSO# 92627 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
Critical Care and Respirology
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Derek John Pereira may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine
            as a Hospitalist, only.