Pereira, Jaime Manuel (CPSO#: 73376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron St. West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone: (519) 235-2700
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pereira ( CPSO# 73376 )

Business Address:
South Huron Hospital
24 Huron Street West
Exeter ON  N0M 1S2
Phone Number: (519) 235-2700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Huron Hospital Exeter

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIME MANUEL PEREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2001