Pereira, Jeffery (CPSO#: 56491)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone: (905) 450-9306
Fax: (905) 450-9304
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffery Pereira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pereira ( CPSO# 56491 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
7900 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 450-9306

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY PEREIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREIRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Rotating - Incomplete Information

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1988