Pereira, Michelle Marie-Clare (CPSO#: 63523)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 2002