Perera, Chamika Nilanga (CPSO#: 96880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: Perera, Welikadage Chamika Nilanga (used until: 17 Feb 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhala

Education:UNIVERSITY OF SRI JAYEWARDENEPURA, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
908 B Garth street
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L2
Phone: (905) 383-8026
Fax: (905) 383-8446
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chamika Perera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Perera ( CPSO# 96880 )

Business Address:
908 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L2
Phone Number: (905) 383-8026

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAMIKA NILANGA PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2014