Perera, Ethige Sheila Chithrangani (CPSO#: 83070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone: (905) 832-3838
Fax: (905) 832-9097
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Perera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Perera ( CPSO# 83070 )

Business Address:
The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Drive
Maple ON  L6A 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 832-3838

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ETHIGE SHEILA CHITHRANGANI PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007