Perera, Francisco Elmer (CPSO#: 52923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. E. Perera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Perera ( CPSO# 52923 )

Business Address:
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8650

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 17 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCISCO ELMER PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 1991