Perera, Rushika Mayeshi (CPSO#: 106698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: 519-661-2111 Ext. 82019
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSHIKA MAYESHI PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017