Perez D'Empaire, Pablo Adolfo (CPSO#: 92487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Del Zulia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PABLO ADOLFO PEREZ D'EMPAIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ D'EMPAIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2010 to 19 May 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2015 to 03 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 04 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017